Wadhwa, Atma Singh (CPSO#: 23939)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 2015