Wadhwa, Gagan Deep Deepa (CPSO#: 91833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
BC Cancer Agency
399 Royal Avenue
Kelowna BC  V1Y 5L3
Phone: (250) 712-3945
Fax: (250) 712-3911

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAGAN DEEP DEEPA WADHWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012