Wadhwa, Mandeep (CPSO#: 92171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health
Unit 8
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3530, Derry road E
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Canada
Phone: 905-672-2273
Fax: 905-672-0487
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandeep Wadhwa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wadhwa ( CPSO# 92171 )

Business Address:
Uptown Health Centre
Unit 8
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone Number: (905) 508-8876

Business Address:
Suite 110 - 111
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 672-2273

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANDEEP WADHWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011