Wadhwa, Uttam Jit Kaur (CPSO#: 76987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
Room 1023 Main Floor
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7580 Ext. 2182
Fax: (905) 804-7969
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: U. Wadhwa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Wadhwa ( CPSO# 76987 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Room 1023 Main Floor
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7557

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UTTAM JIT KAUR WADHWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2007