Wagg, Herbert Ovas (CPSO#: 15286)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 09 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2004