Waggass, Ghouth Abdulmalik S (CPSO#: 110143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHOUTH ABDULMALIK S WAGGASS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WAGGASS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. WAGGASS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WAGGASS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WAGGASS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WAGGASS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WAGGASS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018