Wagler, Amanda Marie (CPSO#: 82067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone: (519) 787-1200
Fax: (519) 787-1803
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanda Wagler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wagler ( CPSO# 82067 )

Business Address:
205 Queen Street East
Lower Level
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 787-1200

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 787-2940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA MARIE WAGLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAGLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 13 Dec 2004 to 19 Dec 2004
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2006