Wagner, Cheryl Ann (CPSO#: 52205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 940
790 Bay Street
P O Box 36
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 926-0101
Fax: (416) 926-1910
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5 Alhambra Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 2S4
Canada
Phone: 416-538-7774
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl Wagner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wagner ( CPSO# 52205 )

Business Address:
PO Box 36
940 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 926-0101

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL ANN WAGNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAGNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984