Wahba, Rasha Gamil (CPSO#: 81383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Names: Wahba, Rasha Gamil Salib (used until: 06 Jun 2006 )     Soliman, Rasha Gamil Salib (used until: 29 May 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Landing Medical Clinic
Credit Landing Shopping Centre
Unit 7
224 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G6
Phone: (905) 271-6455
Fax: (905) 271-6492
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Wahba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wahba ( CPSO# 81383 )

Business Address:
Credit Landing Medical Clinic
Suite 7
224 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G6
Phone Number: (905) 271-6455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Aug 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RASHA GAMIL WAHBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAHBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2006