Wai, Yvonne (CPSO#: 69962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103E
4581 Highway 7
Unionville ON  L3R 1M6
Phone: (905) 479-9693
Fax: (905) 415-1371
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C8
Canada
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE WAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 15 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2000