Wai-Ping, Errol Sonny (CPSO#: 57314)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 11 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Mar 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2002
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Mar 2004

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Nov 2003
Summary:

 On November 18, 2003, the Discipline found Dr. Wai-Ping to be incompetent as defined by subsection 
 52(1) of the Code, in that his care of patients displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment 
 or disregard for the welfare of his patients of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates that he 
 is unfit to continue practise or that his practise should be restricted.   

On March 11, 2004 the 
 Discipline Committee released its decision and reasons including the decision on penalty. The 
 Discipline Committeee ordered that the Registrar revoke Dr. Wai-Ping(s certificate of 
 registration, such revocation to take effect immediately. Revocation takes effect March 11, 2004 
 at 11:59 p.m.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 17, 2003