Waikhom, Rajesh (CPSO#: 108326)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Calicut University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2017