Wainberg, Sara Jeanine (CPSO#: 87929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Fax: (416) 785-2409
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Belmont House
55 Belmont Street
Toronto ON  M5R1R1
Canada
Phone: (416) 964-9231
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Briton House
720 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S2N7
Canada
Phone: 4164873392
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA JEANINE WAINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAINBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 31 Dec 2007 to 11 Jan 2008
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009