Waind, Peter Bruce (CPSO#: 42666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 - 131 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone: (519) 746-1040
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Waind Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Waind ( CPSO# 42666 )

Business Address:
Unit 105
131 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 746-1040

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER BRUCE WAIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAIND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984