Waitzer, Sloane (CPSO#: 33155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Golden Mile Clinic
152 - 1880 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone: (416) 285-7575
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Goldenmile Clinic 1880 Eglinton Ave Scarborough, ON M1L 2L1
Instructions: Written request for copy of medical records should be sent to the attention of Dr. S. Waitzer to the address above.
Date Received: 16 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SLOANE WAITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAITZER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1985