Waja, Lukmaan (CPSO#: 66027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Larocque Road
North Bay ON  P1B 8G3
Phone: (705) 495-3101
Fax: (705) 495-8460
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Waja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Waja ( CPSO# 66027 )

Business Address:
30 Larocque Road
North Bay ON  P1B 8G3
Phone Number: (705) 495-3101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKMAAN WAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAJA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1995