Wakegijig, Annelind Daphne Victoria (CPSO#: 71289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ojibwa

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baawaating Family Health Team
210C Gran Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 0C4
Phone: (705) 575-7191
Fax: (705) 575-7193
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNELIND DAPHNE VICTORIA WAKEGIJIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAKEGIJIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999