Wakeham, Julia Christine (CPSO#: 88104)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Alanna Kalyniuk, Greenwood Medical Centre, Unit 10, 496 Discovery Avenue, Kingston, ON, K7K 7E9
Instructions: The majority of patient medical records for Dr. Wakeham can be accessed by contacting Dr. Alanna Kalyniuk
Date Received: 22 Sep 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 21 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 May 2018