Wakim, Emma Germaine (CPSO#: 71783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: 519-954-3648
Fax: 519-954-3600
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emma G. Wakim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Wakim ( CPSO# 71783 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z2
Phone Number: (519) 570-0090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMA GERMAINE WAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAKIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002