Walc, Leslie Christopher (CPSO#: 70012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayside Medical Center
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone: (705) 549-3939
Fax: (705) 549-0029
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian Bay General Hospital
PO Box 760
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-1300
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Walc ( CPSO# 70012 )

Business Address:
Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone Number: (705) 549-3939

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE CHRISTOPHER WALC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2002