Waldbillig, David Kelly (CPSO#: 63642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6410
Fax: (519) 749-6411
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4242
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Waldbillig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Waldbillig ( CPSO# 63642 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Waterloo ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4242

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6410

Business Address:
Benton Medical Clinic
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Phone Number: (226) 240-3014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KELLY WALDBILLIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDBILLIG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1992