Walde, Paul Lewis David (CPSO#: 27541)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Walde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015