Waldolf, Richard Erik (CPSO#: 88651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winchester District Memorial Hosp
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Waldolf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Waldolf ( CPSO# 88651 )
Dr. M. Espina ( CPSO# 89481 )

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ERIK WALDOLF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDOLF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011