Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Waldron, John Joseph (CPSO#: 20533)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2000