Waldron, John Nicholas (CPSO#: 61393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 6522
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN NICHOLAS WALDRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDRON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jul 1989
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1991