Waldron, Mark Andrew (CPSO#: 68227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Waldron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Waldron ( CPSO# 68227 )

Business Address:
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
115 Barrack Street
Kingston ON  K7K 1G2
Phone Number: (613) 549-1440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ANDREW WALDRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996