Wales, Paul William (CPSO#: 71739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Room 1526
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 201490
Fax: (416) 813-7477
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wales Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wales ( CPSO# 71739 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 12 Oct 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL WILLIAM WALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2002