Wales, Roger Cyril (CPSO#: 24849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 May 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 22 May 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 22 May 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Effective May 22, 2012, the following term, condition and limitation is imposed
            on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Roger Cyril Wales, in accordance
            with paragraph (iv) of the order made on May 15, 2012 by the Inquiries,
            Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
            Ontario:

                    Dr. Wales must cease practising medicine, effective May 22, 2012. 


            As from 12:01 a.m., May 22, 2012, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario made on
            May 15, 2012, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on
            the certificate of registration held by Dr. Roger Cyril Wales:

            (i)   Dr. Wales is restricted from conducting any eye examinations, unless he
            does so in thepresence of a clinical supervisor ("Clinical Supervisor") who is
                  acceptable to the College,  who will conduct  a contemporaneous review of
                  each such case and initial the patient chart to confirm such review;

            (ii)  Dr. Wales' Clinical Supervisor must report to the College monthly for the
            first threemonths  and quarterly thereafter or whenever any concerns arise;

            (iii) Dr. Wales shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his office(s),
            practice(s) andpatient charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of
                  monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order; and

            (iv)  If Dr. Wales is unable to comply with (i) as set out above, Dr. Wales
                  must cease practising medicine immediately until such time as he has
                  obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  The fact that
                  he ceased practising under this condition will constitute a term,
                  condition or limitation on Dr. Wales' Certificate of Registration and
                  said term, condition and limitation may be included on the public
                  register.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jan 2015
Summary:

On January 14, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Roger Cyril Wales committed an 
act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Wales is incompetent. 
Dr. Wales is a General Practitioner (GP) refractionist in solo practice in the Kingston area. 
 
The findings of professional misconduct and incompetence pertain to the following areas of Dr. 
Wales’ practice: 
 
-  his measuring intraocular  pressure by touching the eye with his finger (finger tonometry) 
   instead of using an applanation tonometer to measure numerically; 
-  his failure to measure intraocular  pressure in certain age groups (under 40); 
-  his failure to dilate pupils to look at the fundus/posterior eye; and 
-  his failure to use cycloplegia  in children to obtain proper refraction.  
 
Dr. Wales’ deficiencies in his care and treatment of patients demonstrated a lack of knowledge, 
skill, and judgment of such a nature and to an extent that he is unfit to continue to practise or that 
his practice should be restricted. The Committee found that the deficiencies Dr. Wales displays 
are current. 
 
Disposition 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  the Registrar revoke Dr. Wales’ certificate of registration effective immediately; 
-  Dr. Wales appear before the Committee to be reprimanded within thirty (30) days of the date 
   this Order becomes final; and 
-  Dr. Wales pay costs to the College in the amount of $23,340.00 within thirty (30) days of the 
   date this Order becomes final. 
 
Appeal 
 
On February 11, 2015, Dr. Wales appealed the decision on finding of the Discipline Committee 
to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). On September 1, 2017, Dr. Wales appealed 
the decision on penalty of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional 
Court. Pursuant to s.71 of the Code, the Discipline Committee’s decision remains in effect 
despite the appeal.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Notice of Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Hearing dates: January 27-31, 2014 Penalty Hearing dates: April 24, 26, 27, 2017