Wali, Zubair Abdulhamed M (CPSO#: 88137)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2008 to 21 May 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 May 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 May 2009