Walia, Manjit Singh (CPSO#: 59136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Dec 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1987


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili

Education:University of Sheffield, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
525 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 203
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 744-3301
Fax: (519) 744-3637
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manjit Walia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2007

Dr. M. Walia ( CPSO# 59136 )

Business Address:
203 - 525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MANJIT SINGH WALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Jan 1989 to 20 Mar 1989
Comprehensive - Incomplete Information

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1987