Walia, Sawarn Jit (CPSO#: 81282)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Delhi, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Resident - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 2006