Walji, Moez Badrudin (CPSO#: 43198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1986


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-5247
Fax: (905) 721-3560
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Walji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2006

Dr. M. Walji ( CPSO# 43198 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4937


Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MOEZ BADRUDIN WALJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALJI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1986