Walji, Mohammediqbal Fatehali Hussein (CPSO#: 69815)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Shiraz University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 242 Strood Ave, Winnipeg, MB R2G 1A7
Date Received: 24 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017