Walker, Bradley Douglas (CPSO#: 97042)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2015 to 17 Jan 2016
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jan 2016