Walker, Cyril Robin (CPSO#: 57634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
PO 5777 Stn B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLean and Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McLean ( CPSO# 54360 )
Dr. C. Walker ( CPSO# 57634 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Child and Parent Resource Inst
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 858-2774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYRIL ROBIN WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2011