Walker, David Anthony (CPSO#: 75762)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Southampton, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2000 to 06 Apr 2001
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2001