Walker, Desmond (CPSO#: 21289)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2002