Walker, Douglas Robert (CPSO#: 33831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Fax: (613) 548-2412
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Dept of Radiology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Providence Care Hospital
752 King St West
PO Box 603
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Kingston Medical Imaging
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas R. Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Walker ( CPSO# 33831 )
Dr. K. Walker ( CPSO# 107030)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Radiology Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2301

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Radiology Department
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, McCallum, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Walker ( CPSO# 33831 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 63659 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. S. Grahovac ( CPSO# 54394 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 86450 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS ROBERT WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1994