Walker, George Ross (CPSO#: 52235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4743
Fax: (613) 548-2456
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ross Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Walker ( CPSO# 52235 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE ROSS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1989