Walker, Irwin Ronald (CPSO#: 41934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital And Cancer Ctr
Room A3-65
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76384
Fax: (905) 575-7320
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irwin Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Walker ( CPSO# 41934 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Ctr
711 Concession Street
Suite A3-65
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRWIN RONALD WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994