Walker, John Roberts (CPSO#: 52208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
471 Hibernia Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5W2
Phone: (519) 273-2370
Fax: (519) 273-0150
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. R. Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Walker ( CPSO# 52208 )

Business Address:
471 Hibernia Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5W2
Phone Number: (519) 273-2370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERTS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1988