Walker, Susan Philippa (CPSO#: 87713)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Melbourne, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007