Walker, Tara Lee (CPSO#: 69957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Names: Macdonnell, Tara Lee (used until: 19 Dec 2001 )     Walker, Tara Lee (used until: 30 Jul 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
825 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3J8
Phone: (519) 673-0159
Fax: (519) 673-5384
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tara L. Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Walker ( CPSO# 69957 )

Business Address:
825 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3J8
Phone Number: (519) 673-0159

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA LEE WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998