Walkovich, Peter (CPSO#: 21253)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:McGill University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 88 Woodview Drive Pickering, ON L1V 1L2
Date Received: 28 Jul 2014


Address: 88 Woodview Drive Pickering, ON L1V 1L2
Date Received: 26 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014