Wall, Alastair Robert (CPSO#: 88082)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Feb 2008 to 14 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 2011