Wall, Jane Marie (CPSO#: 57057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7071
Fax: (416) 480-5855
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane Wall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. M. Haider ( CPSO# 57221 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE MARIE WALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1987