Wallace, Alison Meghan Rose (CPSO#: 107842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
North Wing, Room 9N-950
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON MEGHAN ROSE WALLACE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WALLACE is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. WALLACE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WALLACE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WALLACE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WALLACE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WALLACE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Oct 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2015 to 06 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017