Wallace, Charles James (CPSO#: 18844)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Limited Head Office Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 09 Jul 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 30, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Charles J Wallace to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. Charles J Wallace:

(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation by the College regarding whether I have maintained the standard of practice of the profession (the “Investigation”).

Resignation from Practice

(3) Hereby resign from the College effective June 30, 2014 (the “Effective Date”).

(4) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

Resignation of Prescribing Privileges

(9) Undertake and agree that in my practice prior to the Effective Date, I will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); or

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule “B”; and the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule “C”)

Monitored Drugs (as noted in Schedule “D”)

Anti-psychotic medication, anti-depressant medication, anti-anxiety medication, mood stabilizing medication and medication used to promote wakefulness, whether or not they are controlled drugs and substances.

(15) Consent to this Undertaking being entered on the pubic register