Wallace, Eda Jacqueline (CPSO#: 70911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 5912
Fax: (519) 749-4296
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eda Wallace Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Wallace ( CPSO# 70911 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDA JACQUELINE WALLACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLACE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 18 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006