Wallace, George (CPSO#: 23312)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Glasgow, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send their written request to: Appletree Medical Group 2573 Baseline Road. Ottawa, ON K2H 7B3
Date Received: 08 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013